Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Uffe Benne Johansen | 17.08.1998 | 14.05.2003 | direktion |
Åke Lindmark | 17.02.1984 | 17.08.1998 | direktion |
Kim Wiencken | 17.02.1984 | 27.02.1997 | direktion |
Uffe Benne Johansen | 17.02.1984 | 22.12.1993 | direktion |
Allan Gjerdrum | 17.02.1984 | 15.08.1989 | direktion |
Uffe Andersen | 17.02.1984 | 15.08.1989 | direktion |
Henning Bent Holten | 17.02.1984 | 15.08.1989 | direktion |
Christian Laisen | 17.02.1984 | 13.06.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Eva Elisabeth Annell | 17.08.1998 | 14.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Uffe Benne Johansen | 17.02.1984 | 14.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Carl Richard Michael Normann | 17.02.1984 | 14.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Kim Wiencken | 17.02.1984 | 17.08.1998 | bestyrelse |
Carl Henrik Gunnar Fock | 17.02.1984 | 22.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Carl Åke Karman | 17.02.1984 | 22.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Uffe Andersen | 17.02.1984 | 12.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Sigurd Lilienfeldt | 17.02.1984 | 12.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Allan Gjerdrum | 17.02.1984 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Henning Bent Holten | 17.02.1984 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Anders Brogreen | 17.02.1984 | 01.04.1992 | bestyrelse |