Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Marian Devantier | 29.06.1984 | 29.07.2004 | direktion |
Eric Oustrup Kvist | 29.06.1984 | 10.07.1992 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Wagn Adler Andersen | 29.06.1984 | 29.07.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Marian Devantier | 29.06.1984 | 29.07.2004 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Olof Ryving-Jensen | 29.06.1984 | 10.04.1996 | bestyrelse |
Eric Oustrup Kvist | 29.06.1984 | 10.07.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Nissen | 29.06.1984 | 10.07.1992 | bestyrelse |