Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Svend Ejner Pedersen | 29.06.1984 | 08.01.2018 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rene Erik Stoklund Pedersen | 22.01.1998 | 31.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Svend Ejner Pedersen | 29.06.1984 | 31.12.2004 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Elvira Pedersen | 29.06.1984 | 22.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Svend Ejner Pedersen | 29.06.1984 | 24.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Elvira Pedersen | 29.06.1984 | 24.03.1995 | bestyrelse |