Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bodil Thaarup | 27.10.2007 | 30.10.2012 | adm. dir |
Ebbe Ditlev Skandov | 18.12.1983 | 26.10.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Palle Hansen | 11.12.2009 | 04.06.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jytte Gudrun Hansen | 10.12.2009 | 04.06.2011 | formand |
Bodil Thaarup | 10.12.1998 | 30.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Marianne Skandov | 18.12.1983 | 11.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Ebbe Ditlev Skandov | 18.12.1983 | 26.10.2007 | bestyrelse |
Michael Skandov | 18.12.1983 | 31.12.2002 | bestyrelse |