Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Troels Johannes Busk | 08.06.1984 | 29.11.1995 | direktion |
Luis Tommy Christensen Jespergaard | 08.06.1984 | 17.12.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Troels Johannes Busk | 08.06.1984 | 29.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Lisbeth Hofgaard Busk | 08.06.1984 | 29.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jens Skoustrup-Jacobsen | 08.06.1984 | 29.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Luis Tommy Christensen Jespergaard | 08.06.1984 | 21.04.1995 | bestyrelse |