Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Fich Jensen | 07.12.2004 | 05.05.2005 | direktion |
Thomas Ettrup Larsen | 10.03.1997 | 29.08.2000 | direktion |
Allan Kongstad Christiansen | 01.04.1984 | 10.03.1997 | direktion |
Erik Reinholdt Vilhelmsen | 01.04.1984 | 02.04.1996 | direktion |
Anita Frydenlund | 01.04.1984 | 08.12.1993 | direktion |
Mogens Lyndorff | 01.04.1984 | 03.09.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Fich Jensen | 29.08.2000 | 28.01.2005 | bestyrelse |