Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Bendix | 20.03.1984 | 06.05.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Birgitte Kjærgaard Brendstrup | 20.02.2008 | 18.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Eva Østergaard Bendix | 20.02.2008 | 18.02.2013 | formand |
Stig Clement Brendstrup | 20.03.1984 | 18.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Christian Bendix | 20.03.1984 | 18.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Eva Østergaard Bendix | 20.03.1984 | 31.03.1999 | bestyrelse |