Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johannes Sterndorff-Jessen | 01.04.1984 | 12.11.1992 | direktion |
Claus Clausen | 01.04.1984 | 31.03.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Dahl-Jensen | 01.04.1984 | 12.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Knudsen | 01.04.1984 | 12.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Jørgen Nylandsted Andersen | 01.04.1984 | 12.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Claus Birger Winkelmann | 01.04.1984 | 12.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Sterndorff-Jessen | 01.04.1984 | 12.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jens Leif Petersen | 01.04.1984 | 16.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Bjeld | 01.04.1984 | 16.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Møberg | 01.04.1984 | 09.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Vium | 01.04.1984 | 09.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Niels-Bo Christensen | 01.04.1984 | 09.01.1990 | bestyrelse |