Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Klitholm | 01.02.2008 | 11.07.2008 | adm. dir |
Lars Billeschou | 10.04.2007 | 31.01.2008 | adm. dir |
Arne Olsen | 15.02.1984 | 10.04.2007 | direktion |
Knud Arne Petersen | 15.02.1984 | 03.01.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Richardt | 01.02.2008 | 11.07.2008 | bestyrelse |
Lars Aaen | 01.04.2007 | 11.07.2008 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Rasmussen | 01.04.2007 | 11.07.2008 | formand |
Morten Søvsø Pedersen | 22.09.2005 | 31.03.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lars Billeschou | 18.03.2005 | 31.01.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henning Jørgensen | 16.04.2004 | 18.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Andsbjerg | 03.04.2002 | 11.07.2008 | bestyrelse |
Per Jensen | 03.04.2002 | 16.04.2004 | næstformand |
Kurt Højbjerg Hansen | 18.05.2001 | 18.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Frank Skorstengaard | 23.10.1998 | 31.03.2007 | næstformand |
Niels Peter Møller | 23.10.1998 | 18.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Torben Olsen | 23.10.1998 | 18.05.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Nygaard | 01.01.1998 | 23.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Erik Mathiassen | 15.02.1984 | 03.04.2002 | formand |
Henning Gert Pedersen | 15.02.1984 | 23.10.1998 | næstformand |
Arne Axel Reckweg Rossing | 15.02.1984 | 01.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Knud Arne Petersen | 15.02.1984 | 06.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Hans Peter Nielsen | 15.02.1984 | 06.07.1994 | formand |
Frode Thomsen Callesen | 15.02.1984 | 06.07.1994 | næstformand |
Knud Erik Krey Nellemann | 15.02.1984 | 19.03.1991 | formand |
Ivan Heine Hermansen | 15.02.1984 | 29.10.1990 | bestyrelse |