Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Foldager | 27.11.2006 | 18.12.2007 | direktion |
Klaus Jørgen Sørensen | 14.12.1995 | 31.01.2001 | direktion |
Geir Magnus Jansen | 24.06.1983 | 14.12.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Foldager | 19.12.2006 | 18.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Krusell Sørensen | 06.02.2003 | 19.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Jørgen Sørensen | 14.12.1995 | 06.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Erik Paaske | 24.06.1983 | 18.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Palle Isaksen | 24.06.1983 | 18.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Geir Magnus Jansen | 24.06.1983 | 18.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lund | 24.06.1983 | 18.12.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Rehling | 24.06.1983 | 21.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Jørgensen | 24.06.1983 | 09.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Peder Christian Pedersen | 24.06.1983 | 24.03.1992 | bestyrelse |
Steen Ladefoged | 24.06.1983 | 09.03.1989 | bestyrelse |
Poul Georg Jensen | 24.06.1983 | 15.07.1988 | bestyrelse |