Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Johansen | 16.12.1983 | 13.03.1996 | direktion |
Vivi Marianne Jensen | 16.12.1983 | 23.12.1991 | direktion |
Torben Ingemann | 16.12.1983 | 07.03.1990 | direktion |
Lars Erik Jærrefors | 16.12.1983 | 09.02.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Bach | 16.12.1983 | 13.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Johansen | 16.12.1983 | 13.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Lars Yngve Berggren | 16.12.1983 | 13.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Leif Bert Leonard Petersson | 16.12.1983 | 13.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Benny Schwartz | 16.12.1983 | 23.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Vivi Marianne Jensen | 16.12.1983 | 23.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Eigil Birger Hansen | 16.12.1983 | 27.12.1990 | bestyrelse |
Torben Ingemann | 16.12.1983 | 07.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Bergstrøm | 16.12.1983 | 07.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Gustaf Stolpe | 16.12.1983 | 07.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Sten Hellstrøm-Møller | 16.12.1983 | 18.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Nils Bertil Carstam | 16.12.1983 | 18.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Lars Arne Larsson | 16.12.1983 | 18.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Lars Erik Jærrefors | 16.12.1983 | 09.02.1988 | bestyrelse |