Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Martin Simonsen | 07.11.1983 | 20.07.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Vera Simonsen | 13.11.1996 | 20.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Per Hasselager | 13.11.1996 | 20.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Ole Martin Olsen | 15.01.1993 | 17.03.1994 | bestyrelse |
Morten Darling Jacobsen | 10.11.1992 | 20.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Martin Simonsen | 07.11.1983 | 20.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Anette Søndergaard | 07.11.1983 | 20.07.1999 | bestyrelse |
Annalise Hasselager | 07.11.1983 | 13.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Benny Jensen Simonsen | 07.11.1983 | 13.11.1996 | bestyrelse |
Hans Morten Kjærsgaard | 07.11.1983 | 10.11.1992 | bestyrelse |
Christian Simonsen | 07.11.1983 | 30.11.1989 | bestyrelse |