Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Jensen Holm | 24.06.1983 | 01.11.1997 | direktion |
Jørgen Lauridsen | 24.06.1983 | 24.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Velling Pedersen | 23.11.1995 | 01.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Gert Lund | 24.06.1983 | 01.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jens Hald Mortensen | 24.06.1983 | 01.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Susanne Bjerrisgaard | 24.06.1983 | 01.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Gøte | 24.06.1983 | 01.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Geir Magnus Jansen | 24.06.1983 | 23.11.1995 | bestyrelse |
Preben Alberg Holm | 24.06.1983 | 09.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Hans Sodtmann Bundgaard | 24.06.1983 | 09.09.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Lauridsen | 24.06.1983 | 24.06.1988 | bestyrelse |