Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pia Larsen | 16.12.1982 | 12.01.2021 | direktion |
Carl Emil Larsen | 16.12.1982 | 30.05.1994 | direktion |
Svend Aage Voss | 16.12.1982 | 09.04.1991 | direktion |
Uffe Bernhard Hartmann | 16.12.1982 | 22.03.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tove Iversen | 16.12.1982 | 12.01.2021 | bestyrelse |
Pia Larsen | 16.12.1982 | 12.01.2021 | bestyrelse |
Brita Larsen | 16.12.1982 | 12.01.2021 | bestyrelse |
Laila Thomas | 16.12.1982 | 15.09.1999 | bestyrelse |
Kim Holm Hansen | 16.12.1982 | 30.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Arne Paabøl Andersen | 16.12.1982 | 30.05.1994 | formand |
Carl Emil Larsen | 16.12.1982 | 09.04.1991 | formand |
Dan Børge Larsen | 16.12.1982 | 22.03.1990 | formand |