Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Evald Lykke Gregersen | 29.12.1982 | 17.10.2002 | direktion |
Villy Andersen | 29.12.1982 | 30.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Evald Lykke Gregersen | 29.12.1982 | 18.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Ditlev Gregersen | 29.12.1982 | 18.09.1996 | bestyrelse |