Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 22.12.1993 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 27.06.1983 | 18.05.2005 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 27.06.1983 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Hans Kristian Jagd | 27.06.1983 | 05.02.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Norup Koch | 27.06.1983 | 05.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Hans Kristian Jagd | 27.06.1983 | 05.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Jagd | 27.06.1983 | 05.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ole Roland Pedersen | 27.06.1983 | 05.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Ivan Rahbæk | 27.06.1983 | 25.02.1991 | bestyrelse |
Peder Georg Mortensen | 27.06.1983 | 25.02.1991 | bestyrelse |