Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Bruun Steiner | 30.12.2009 | 09.10.2018 | direktion |
Kurt Alex Lykkemeier | 30.12.2009 | 20.03.2018 | direktion |
Sanne Henrichsen | 21.04.2004 | 30.12.2009 | direktion |
Morten Bruun Steiner | 14.05.1982 | 21.04.2004 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Alex Lykkemeier | 30.12.2009 | 30.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Morten Bruun Steiner | 30.12.2009 | 30.12.2009 | formand |
Erik Steiner | 21.04.2004 | 30.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Fritze Henriette Steiner-Johnsen | 28.01.1999 | 21.04.2004 | formand |
Jesper Steiner | 14.05.1982 | 20.02.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bent Erik Rene Andersen | 14.05.1982 | 18.01.2001 | bestyrelse |
Elisabeth Steiner | 14.05.1982 | 28.12.1998 | formand |
Erik Steiner | 14.05.1982 | 16.03.1997 | formand |
Vagn Frede Kofoed Steiner | 14.05.1982 | 11.05.1992 | bestyrelse |