Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erling Bo Pedersen | 31.10.1986 | 11.08.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pia Buchardt Pedersen | 21.05.2005 | 26.02.2010 | formand |
Erling Bo Pedersen | 31.10.1986 | 21.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Buchardt Pedersen | 31.10.1986 | 21.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Anders Buchardt Pedersen | 31.10.1986 | 21.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Yelva Pauline Pedersen | 31.10.1986 | 16.06.1994 | formand |
Viggo Pedersen | 31.10.1986 | 06.07.1989 | formand |