Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Godt | 26.11.1982 | 17.02.2003 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Godt | 26.11.1982 | 04.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Helge Thyssen Jørgensen | 26.11.1982 | 04.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Bent Laas | 26.11.1982 | 04.01.2000 | bestyrelse |
Dan Børge Larsen | 26.11.1982 | 29.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Rudi Thornemann Hansen | 26.11.1982 | 12.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Erik Johansen | 26.11.1982 | 12.12.1994 | bestyrelse |