Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Villy Eriksson | 01.03.1982 | 10.06.1993 | direktion |
Bjarne Ewald Thomsen | 01.03.1982 | 17.09.1990 | direktion |
Verner Villy Eriksson | 01.03.1982 | 17.09.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Per Herhold Christensen | 01.03.1982 | 10.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Ewald Thomsen | 01.03.1982 | 10.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Bent Villy Eriksson | 01.03.1982 | 10.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Finn Andrea | 01.03.1982 | 17.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Agertoft Greve | 01.03.1982 | 17.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Leif Jensen | 01.03.1982 | 17.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Verner Villy Eriksson | 01.03.1982 | 17.09.1990 | bestyrelse |
Preben Møller-Larsen | 01.03.1982 | 04.01.1990 | bestyrelse |