Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Fedder Peter Hindrichsen | 26.07.2001 | 24.02.2018 | direktion |
Hans Fedder Hindrichsen | 11.10.1947 | 26.07.2001 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Magda Margaretha Andresen | 30.01.2008 | 24.02.2018 | bestyrelse |
Lis Hindrichsen | 26.07.2001 | 24.02.2018 | bestyrelse |
Ursula Hindrichsen | 11.10.1947 | 24.02.2018 | bestyrelse |
Annelise Hindrichsen | 11.10.1947 | 08.12.2006 | bestyrelse |
Hans Fedder Hindrichsen | 11.10.1947 | 07.04.2001 | bestyrelse |
Ebbe Hindrichsen | 11.10.1947 | 28.11.1989 | formand |