Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 23.05.1992 | direktion |
Carsten Van Bruun Jespersen | 24.06.1981 | 27.03.1991 | direktion |
Vagner Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 04.03.1991 | direktion |
Henrik Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 06.12.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 23.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Tom Herman Jensen | 24.06.1981 | 23.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 23.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Van Bruun Jespersen | 24.06.1981 | 27.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Lone Jespersen | 24.06.1981 | 27.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Roar Jespersen | 24.06.1981 | 27.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Vagner Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 04.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Karen Margrethe Juel Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 04.03.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 04.03.1991 | formand |
Johannes Christian Nielsen | 24.06.1981 | 06.12.1989 | formand |