Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lau Laursen | 06.02.1981 | 07.12.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Ulrik Witthøft Groth | 01.04.2010 | 07.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Frederik Peter Bodum Groth | 01.04.2010 | 07.12.2011 | formand |
Peter Groth | 16.05.2007 | 01.04.2010 | bestyrelse |
Anders Brodin | 01.03.1999 | 19.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Leif Aage Hagen | 08.02.1999 | 16.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Lau Laursen | 06.02.1981 | 07.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Halvor Bache Halvorsen | 06.02.1981 | 01.03.1999 | bestyrelse |
Preben Max Rabenhorst | 06.02.1981 | 08.02.1999 | bestyrelse |