Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Reimesch Koefoed | 20.04.1993 | 22.12.1993 | direktion |
Dimitre Vassilev Popov | 28.10.1980 | 17.02.2004 | direktion |
Bjørn Stiedl | 28.10.1980 | 20.04.1993 | direktion |
Ella Jensen | 28.10.1980 | 31.03.1993 | direktion |
Leif Arendschneider Jensen | 28.10.1980 | 01.07.1992 | direktion |