Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Giversen | 07.11.1995 | 03.05.2005 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anette Broløs | 10.01.2003 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Lasse Nyby | 11.04.2000 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Ole Kamstrup | 11.04.2000 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
John Lundsgaard | 11.04.2000 | 03.05.2005 | næstformand |
John Lundsgaard | 11.04.2000 | 11.04.2000 | personlig_suppleant |
Ivan Christiansen | 22.04.1999 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Knud Erik Lykke | 22.04.1999 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Jacob Leth | 22.04.1999 | 03.05.2005 | næstformand |
Svend Jørgensen | 22.04.1999 | 24.05.2000 | personlig_suppleant |
Svend Jørgensen | 22.04.1999 | 22.04.1999 | bestyrelse |
Preben Helge Rasmussen | 15.04.1999 | 03.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Preben Lykkegaard Andersen | 16.04.1998 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Poul Richardt Korreborg Balle | 16.04.1998 | 10.01.2003 | personlig_suppleant |
Finn Birger Allingstrup | 08.12.1997 | 03.05.2005 | formand |
Ole Lyngh Jørgensen | 08.12.1997 | 24.05.2000 | formand |
Finn Birger Allingstrup | 08.12.1997 | 08.12.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Bjarne Wind | 01.07.1996 | 22.05.1997 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Hansen | 28.03.1996 | 16.04.1998 | suppleant |
Henrik Thufason | 28.03.1996 | 22.05.1997 | suppleant |
Poul Richardt Korreborg Balle | 28.03.1996 | 22.05.1997 | suppleant |
Lasse Nyby | 28.03.1996 | 22.05.1997 | suppleant |
Hans-Ole Jochumsen | 28.03.1996 | 01.07.1996 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Hansen | 28.03.1996 | 28.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Karl Ove Kristensen | 07.11.1995 | 03.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Peter Schou | 07.11.1995 | 03.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Kracht | 07.11.1995 | 03.05.2005 | bestyrelse |
Lynge Thang Jørgensen | 07.11.1995 | 03.05.2005 | personlig_suppleant |
Peter Ernst Bager | 07.11.1995 | 16.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Gertrud Rahbek | 07.11.1995 | 16.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Per Gydov | 07.11.1995 | 16.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Brun Steffensen | 07.11.1995 | 16.04.1998 | bestyrelse |
Niels Christian Knudsen | 07.11.1995 | 08.12.1997 | formand |
Gert Vagn Kristensen | 07.11.1995 | 22.05.1997 | formand |
Steen Aage Bache | 07.11.1995 | 28.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jette Lyng Giversen | 07.11.1995 | 12.12.1995 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Hansen | 07.11.1995 | 12.12.1995 | suppleant |
Rie Birketoft | 08.06.1995 | 16.04.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Jan Olsen | 08.06.1995 | 16.04.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Finn Pedersen | 08.06.1995 | 16.04.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Steen Olsen | 08.05.1995 | 16.04.1998 | personlig_suppleant |