Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Stadsvold Olesen | 01.03.1994 | 19.02.1998 | direktion |
John Andersen | 24.09.1980 | 01.03.1995 | direktion |
Egon Olsen | 24.09.1980 | 23.04.1992 | direktion |
Leif Jensen | 24.09.1980 | 26.02.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Evald Herman Jespersen | 26.03.2002 | 29.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Noel Fynbo Petersen | 25.01.2002 | 29.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Andreasen Ljungberg | 25.01.2002 | 29.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Lone Hedegaard Petersen | 24.02.2001 | 29.01.2003 | formand |
Villy Elmo Nielsen | 24.02.2001 | 26.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Evald Herman Jespersen | 24.02.2001 | 25.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Laurits Bent Jensen | 19.02.1998 | 29.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Stadsvold Olesen | 19.02.1998 | 25.01.2002 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Hansen | 19.11.1994 | 24.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Evald Østerby Frederiksen | 01.03.1994 | 24.02.2001 | formand |
Robert Madsen | 24.09.1980 | 24.02.2001 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Wetche | 24.09.1980 | 24.02.2001 | bestyrelse |