Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Erik Falk Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | direktion |
Ole Jakobsen | 07.07.1980 | 25.10.1995 | direktion |
Poul Bendix Sørensen | 07.07.1980 | 06.04.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Bentsen | 05.03.1997 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Korsbjerg Rasmussen | 05.03.1997 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Jens Møller Hansen | 05.03.1997 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Hans Evald Nielsen | 05.03.1997 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Henrik Bentsen | 05.03.1997 | 05.03.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Gert Sørensen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Frank Bunde | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Anders Knud Schmeltzer Christensen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Aage Heering Nielsen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Paul Kejlberg | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Christian Østergaard | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Claus Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hermansen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Elsebeth Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Kurt Sørensen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Peter Bredahl Rasmussen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Lars Lyse Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Michael Werner Hytting | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Erik West Hoffmeyer | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Erling Pallesen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Léon Rochat Rasmussen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | formand |
Erling Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 09.02.1998 | næstformand |
Leif Nørgaard Larsen | 07.07.1980 | 05.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Møller Petersen | 07.07.1980 | 05.03.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Joan Piltoft Nielsen | 07.07.1980 | 05.03.1997 | personlig_suppleant |
Orla Astrup Nielsen | 07.07.1980 | 08.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Nonbye | 07.07.1980 | 08.03.1996 | personlig_suppleant |
Poul Gunner Lauridsen Sørensen | 07.07.1980 | 13.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Verner Østergaard | 07.07.1980 | 13.03.1995 | personlig_suppleant |
Asta Lilly Rasmussen | 07.07.1980 | 11.03.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Leif Hansen Juul | 07.07.1980 | 06.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Børge Mortensen | 07.07.1980 | 06.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Leif Nørgaard Larsen | 07.07.1980 | 06.04.1993 | personlig_suppleant |
Poul Kristian Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 06.04.1993 | personlig_suppleant |
Claus Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 06.04.1993 | suppleant |
Elsebeth Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 09.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Poul Gunner Lauridsen Sørensen | 07.07.1980 | 09.04.1992 | personlig_suppleant |
Jan Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 09.04.1992 | personlig_suppleant |
Sven Kristensen | 07.07.1980 | 20.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Bent Busk Pedersen | 07.07.1980 | 20.06.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Lene Brok Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 20.06.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Flemming Hye-Knudsen | 07.07.1980 | 20.06.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Peter Christian Østergaard | 07.07.1980 | 20.06.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Haydar Øzkan | 07.07.1980 | 26.03.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Henning Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 29.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Birte Bjerregaard Torstensen | 07.07.1980 | 29.05.1989 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Vissing Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 29.05.1989 | personlig_suppleant |
Jørn Østergaard Kruse | 07.07.1980 | 28.03.1988 | bestyrelse |
Frede Borg-Jensen | 07.07.1980 | 28.03.1988 | personlig_suppleant |
Frede Kristian Kristensen | 07.07.1980 | 28.03.1988 | personlig_suppleant |
Erling Hansen | 07.07.1980 | 28.03.1988 | personlig_suppleant |
Henning Jørgensen | 07.07.1980 | 28.03.1988 | næstformand |