Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helge Holger Jensen | 31.03.1908 | 31.05.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helge Holger Jensen | 31.03.1908 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Lone Jensen | 31.03.1908 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Uni Henriette Steenberg | 31.03.1908 | 31.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Tina Rodrigues Ascensao Martins | 31.03.1908 | 06.11.2003 | bestyrelse |
Arne Olsen | 31.03.1908 | 22.07.1991 | bestyrelse |
Peter Felix Tschudi | 31.03.1908 | 14.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Birte Nøhr Hansen | 31.03.1908 | 14.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Axel Hjerl Hansen | 31.03.1908 | 14.03.1990 | bestyrelse |
Birger Arnold Nordsted-Jørgensen | 31.03.1908 | 14.03.1990 | bestyrelse |