Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kent Tony Jensen Hestehave | 01.06.1999 | 05.12.2008 | direktion |
Marinus Willem Smits | 30.04.1964 | 01.06.1999 | direktion |
Tom Heide Jensen | 30.04.1964 | 30.04.1996 | direktion |
Bent Rosenbeck | 30.04.1964 | 30.04.1996 | direktion |
Finn Povlsen | 30.04.1964 | 05.05.1994 | direktion |
Marinus Smits | 30.04.1964 | 07.09.1988 | direktion |
Kaj Larsen | 30.04.1964 | 10.11.1987 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jette Smits | 02.03.2000 | 05.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kent Tony Jensen Hestehave | 02.03.2000 | 05.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Marinus Willem Smits | 30.04.1964 | 05.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bruno Pedersen | 30.04.1964 | 02.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Marinus Smits | 30.04.1964 | 02.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Richardt Thomas Larsen | 30.04.1964 | 26.01.1990 | bestyrelse |
Jens Peter Jensen | 30.04.1964 | 10.11.1987 | bestyrelse |