Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Poul Petersen | 13.04.1965 | 14.04.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pia Barnow | 13.03.2003 | 14.04.2015 | bestyrelse |
Kim Petersen | 13.03.2003 | 14.04.2015 | bestyrelse |
Ole Poul Petersen | 13.04.1965 | 14.04.2015 | bestyrelse |
Inge Jersild Petersen | 13.04.1965 | 13.03.2003 | bestyrelse |
Anna Lise Wilmann | 13.04.1965 | 01.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Emmy Katrine Petersen | 13.04.1965 | 11.04.1994 | bestyrelse |