Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Conny Ransborg | 03.02.1982 | 12.05.2003 | direktion |
Birgit Thomsen | 03.02.1982 | 30.03.1998 | direktion |
Knud Christensen | 03.02.1982 | 23.07.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Lundsgaard Martinussen | 12.04.2002 | 12.05.2003 | suppleant |
Klaus Overgaard | 12.04.2002 | 12.05.2003 | suppleant |
Klaus Overgaard | 12.04.2002 | 12.04.2002 | suppleant |
Finn Holm-Jørgensen | 13.03.2002 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Helga Ottilie Kallehave Andersen | 13.03.2002 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Andersen | 13.03.2002 | 12.05.2003 | suppleant |
Kjeld Andersen | 13.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | personlig_suppleant |
Jesper Birk Olsen | 14.03.2001 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Dorrit Margrethe Hansen | 14.03.2001 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ernst Emil Jensen | 14.03.2001 | 13.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Erik Kyhl | 14.03.2001 | 13.03.2002 | suppleant |
Helga Ottilie Kallehave Andersen | 14.03.2001 | 13.03.2002 | suppleant |
Bodil Ingrid Ferdinand | 14.03.2001 | 13.03.2002 | suppleant |
Christian Ditlev Ravnborg | 14.03.2001 | 13.03.2002 | suppleant |
Uffe Espersen | 15.03.2000 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Gregersen | 15.03.2000 | 13.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Esben Thomas Olsen | 15.03.2000 | 14.03.2001 | suppleant |
Inge Jensen | 15.03.2000 | 14.03.2001 | suppleant |
Helle Mølager | 15.03.2000 | 14.03.2001 | suppleant |
Esben Thomas Olsen | 15.03.2000 | 15.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Inge Jensen | 15.03.2000 | 15.03.2000 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Birk Olsen | 17.03.1999 | 23.03.2001 | suppleant |
Inge Bondo Hune | 17.03.1999 | 15.03.2000 | suppleant |
Claus Bo Jensen | 05.03.1997 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Bodil Dalsgaard Knudsen | 05.03.1997 | 15.03.2000 | suppleant |
Aase Jensen | 05.03.1997 | 15.03.2000 | suppleant |
Alice Simonsen | 05.03.1997 | 30.03.1998 | suppleant |
Alice Simonsen | 05.03.1997 | 05.03.1997 | næstformand |
Martin Borch Jeppesen | 08.03.1995 | 13.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Erling Steen Reinholdt Sørensen | 08.03.1995 | 14.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Simonsen | 08.03.1995 | 14.03.2001 | formand |
Arne Alf Frandsen | 08.03.1995 | 30.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Ole Sofus Christensen | 08.03.1995 | 19.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Nielsen | 08.03.1995 | 19.03.1996 | suppleant |
Osvald Magne Grefstad | 08.03.1995 | 19.03.1996 | suppleant |
Jørgen Schjønning | 08.03.1995 | 19.03.1996 | suppleant |
Jens Peter Villumsen | 08.03.1995 | 19.03.1996 | suppleant |
Jacob Nielsen | 08.03.1995 | 08.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Simonsen | 08.03.1995 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
Peter Blem Dahl | 03.02.1982 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Karen Marie Nielsen | 03.02.1982 | 12.05.2003 | bestyrelse |
Ejvind Bøttcher | 03.02.1982 | 13.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Claus Lundsgaard Martinussen | 03.02.1982 | 13.03.2002 | suppleant |
Kjeld Helmer Jensen | 03.02.1982 | 14.03.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Schjønning | 03.02.1982 | 15.03.2000 | suppleant |
Ebbe Wiberg | 03.02.1982 | 17.03.1999 | suppleant |
Geert Brink | 03.02.1982 | 17.03.1999 | suppleant |
Birger Peter Toyberg Jensen | 03.02.1982 | 30.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Claus Lundsgaard Martinussen | 03.02.1982 | 23.07.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Helmer Jensen | 03.02.1982 | 23.07.1997 | suppleant |
Claus Lundsgaard Martinussen | 03.02.1982 | 23.07.1997 | suppleant |
Preben Nicolai Hansen Stolberg | 03.02.1982 | 23.07.1997 | formand |
Grethe Marianne Olsen | 03.02.1982 | 05.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Hans Juul Jensen | 03.02.1982 | 05.03.1997 | suppleant |
Karen Marie Nielsen | 03.02.1982 | 05.03.1997 | suppleant |
Jørgen Schjønning | 03.02.1982 | 08.05.1996 | suppleant |
Marianne Susanne Røgen | 03.02.1982 | 19.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
John Nielsen | 03.02.1982 | 19.03.1996 | næstformand |
Tage Flemming Horn | 03.02.1982 | 28.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Palle Laurits Herskind Andersen | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christian Agerbo Larsen | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Elisabeth Hansen | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
Jim Blom Larsen | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
John Lindegaard Weirum | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
Aase Krogh | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
Geert Ebbesen Smed | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
Henning Vagn Petersen | 03.02.1982 | 08.03.1995 | suppleant |
Ebbe Wiberg | 03.02.1982 | 19.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Knudsen | 03.02.1982 | 19.05.1994 | bestyrelse |
Helge Møller Olsen | 03.02.1982 | 19.05.1994 | suppleant |
Osvald Magne Grefstad | 03.02.1982 | 19.05.1994 | suppleant |
John Lindegaard Weirum | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
John Søndergaard Hald | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Ole Madsen | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | bestyrelse |
Svend Aage Knudsen | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | personlig_suppleant |
Bent Skovgaard Christensen | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | suppleant |
Erik Dhiin | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | suppleant |
Jytte Merete Simonsen | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | suppleant |
Poul Anker Chodziuk | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | suppleant |
Børge Freiesleben Abrahamsen | 03.02.1982 | 29.04.1993 | formand |
Tage Flemming Horn | 03.02.1982 | 06.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Kyhl | 03.02.1982 | 06.04.1992 | personlig_suppleant |
Helge Nielsen | 03.02.1982 | 06.04.1992 | suppleant |
Bent Thinggaard Jensen | 03.02.1982 | 06.04.1992 | suppleant |
Morten Glerup | 03.02.1982 | 06.04.1992 | suppleant |
Helge Bernhardt Larsen | 03.02.1982 | 22.04.1991 | suppleant |
Henning Aage Aastrup Sørensen | 03.02.1982 | 22.04.1991 | suppleant |
Jørgen Thygesen | 03.02.1982 | 23.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Bent Laursen | 03.02.1982 | 23.08.1990 | suppleant |
Ove Pedersen | 03.02.1982 | 23.08.1990 | suppleant |
John Erik Jakobsen | 03.02.1982 | 23.08.1990 | suppleant |
Knud Folke Larsen | 03.02.1982 | 23.08.1990 | suppleant |
Finn Heerwagen | 03.02.1982 | 23.08.1990 | næstformand |
Ejlif Osvald Thulin | 03.02.1982 | 30.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
Børge Petersen | 03.02.1982 | 30.04.1990 | bestyrelse |
John Lindegaard Weirum | 03.02.1982 | 30.04.1990 | suppleant |
Carsten Bønding Mortensen | 03.02.1982 | 30.04.1990 | suppleant |
Karl Ole Alvdahl Hansen | 03.02.1982 | 20.04.1988 | bestyrelse |
Børge Freiesleben Abrahamsen | 03.02.1982 | 20.04.1988 | suppleant |
John Kaj Bill | 03.02.1982 | 20.04.1988 | formand |