Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kjeld Kristian Jensen | 29.05.1980 | 07.08.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kjeld Kristian Jensen | 30.06.1998 | 07.08.2002 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Sofie Holmegaard Jensen | 30.06.1998 | 07.08.2002 | bestyrelse |
Anna Marie Andersen | 30.06.1998 | 26.11.2001 | bestyrelse |