Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens-Erik Linde | 10.12.1976 | 21.02.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens-Erik Linde | 10.12.1976 | 21.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Stylsvig Jensen | 10.12.1976 | 14.02.2006 | bestyrelse |
Daisy Lillian Linde | 10.12.1976 | 31.01.2006 | bestyrelse |
Henning Palm Lyngsbo | 10.12.1976 | 12.09.1994 | formand |
Keld Stephansen | 10.12.1976 | 07.01.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Frederik Linde | 10.12.1976 | 11.01.1991 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Lyngsdal | 10.12.1976 | 01.09.1988 | bestyrelse |