Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Egon Larsen | 20.11.1975 | 14.02.1997 | direktion |
Erik Bagger Coordt | 20.11.1975 | 28.03.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Egon Larsen | 20.11.1975 | 03.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Niels Walentin Jensen | 20.11.1975 | 03.03.1995 | bestyrelse |
Aase Pflug Larsen | 20.11.1975 | 03.03.1995 | bestyrelse |