Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Arne Skov Schmidt | 15.07.1975 | 23.01.2003 | direktion |
Sven Trillingsgaard | 15.07.1975 | 10.05.1989 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tim Lykke Jensen | 29.01.1998 | 23.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Arne Skov Schmidt | 29.01.1998 | 23.01.2003 | bestyrelse |
Pia Valbak Schmidt | 29.01.1998 | 23.01.2003 | formand |