Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Christian Clausen | 15.04.1975 | 03.04.1992 | direktion |
Kaj Karsten Witthøfft | 15.04.1975 | 28.05.1991 | direktion |
Karl-Otto Kristiansen | 15.04.1975 | 22.08.1989 | direktion |
Aage Andersen | 15.04.1975 | 21.07.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Christian Clausen | 15.04.1975 | 03.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Preben Johannes Hemmingsen Berg | 15.04.1975 | 03.04.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jan Reinholt Frick-Jensen | 15.04.1975 | 03.04.1992 | formand |
Björn Carl-Olof Sjöberg | 15.04.1975 | 28.05.1991 | bestyrelse |
Preben Harton Blankensteiner | 15.04.1975 | 28.05.1991 | formand |
Torben Kargaard Jensen | 15.04.1975 | 22.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Karl-Otto Kristiansen | 15.04.1975 | 22.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Frode Carl Wolffhechel | 15.04.1975 | 22.08.1989 | bestyrelse |
Poul Erik Petersen | 15.04.1975 | 28.11.1988 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Kaj Andersen | 15.04.1975 | 21.07.1988 | bestyrelse |
Anne Lise Andersen | 15.04.1975 | 21.07.1988 | bestyrelse |
Aage Andersen | 15.04.1975 | 21.07.1988 | bestyrelse |