Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Frank Herlev Sørensen | 17.06.1974 | 27.10.1992 | direktion |
Ruth Leighton Jensen | 17.06.1974 | 05.05.1992 | direktion |
Hans Vilhelm Jensen | 17.06.1974 | 22.08.1990 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Bergmann Larsen | 17.06.1974 | 27.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ingolf Jacob Angel | 17.06.1974 | 27.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Frank Herlev Sørensen | 17.06.1974 | 27.10.1992 | bestyrelse |
Lars Leighton Jensen | 17.06.1974 | 05.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hanne Leighton Andersen | 17.06.1974 | 05.05.1992 | bestyrelse |
Ruth Leighton Jensen | 17.06.1974 | 05.05.1992 | formand |
Hans Vilhelm Jensen | 17.06.1974 | 22.08.1990 | bestyrelse |