Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Sven Michael Andersen | 24.10.1973 | 15.08.1994 | direktion |
Michael Ejner Andersen | 24.10.1973 | 28.01.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Grethe Hellner Andersen | 24.10.1973 | 15.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Sven Michael Andersen | 24.10.1973 | 15.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Rolf Michael Andersen | 24.10.1973 | 15.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Michael Ejner Andersen | 24.10.1973 | 27.01.1992 | bestyrelse |