Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Susan Storm | 17.07.2007 | 03.09.2007 | direktion |
Georg Møller | 01.03.2006 | 17.07.2007 | direktion |
Jesper Busk | 03.10.2005 | 01.03.2006 | direktion |
Jan Niels Werum Nilsson | 13.12.1974 | 03.10.2005 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Fredborg Andreasen | 17.07.2007 | 03.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Cramer | 17.07.2007 | 03.09.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jan Kreiberg Larsen | 17.07.2007 | 03.09.2007 | formand |
Henrik Axel Juul Nordenlund | 01.03.2006 | 17.07.2007 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Busk | 01.03.2006 | 17.07.2007 | formand |
Johan Kristian Tuft | 03.10.2005 | 14.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Lars Michael Folkmann | 03.10.2005 | 01.03.2006 | bestyrelse |
Allan Claude Aebischer | 03.10.2005 | 01.03.2006 | formand |
Kåre Bo Stolt | 14.03.2005 | 03.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Torben Lund Nielsen | 07.02.2000 | 03.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Torben Lund Nielsen | 13.06.1997 | 01.11.1999 | bestyrelse |
Jan Niels Werum Nilsson | 13.12.1974 | 03.10.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Løjstrup | 13.12.1974 | 14.03.2005 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Werum Nilsson | 13.12.1974 | 07.02.2000 | bestyrelse |
Niels Marne Salmony | 13.12.1974 | 18.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Britton Jørgensen | 13.12.1974 | 18.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Nørgaard Bach | 13.12.1974 | 01.06.1997 | bestyrelse |
Knud Jensen | 13.12.1974 | 12.03.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jan Halling | 13.12.1974 | 03.11.1993 | bestyrelse |
Lise Andersen | 13.12.1974 | 25.11.1988 | bestyrelse |