Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marie-Louise Piil Christensen | 20.10.2006 | 03.07.2014 | adm. dir |
Tonny Willy Pold Christensen | 14.03.1973 | 18.10.2006 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kaja Alvilda Christensen | 19.06.2007 | 03.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Valdemar Bandolowski | 14.03.1973 | 03.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Marie-Louise Piil Christensen | 14.03.1973 | 03.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Tonny Willy Pold Christensen | 14.03.1973 | 09.06.2007 | bestyrelse |
Steen Hjorth Christensen | 14.03.1973 | 05.10.1999 | bestyrelse |