Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørn Haargaard | 03.09.1976 | 07.08.1995 | direktion |
Niels Povl Lund Holm | 03.09.1976 | 06.07.1994 | direktion |
Jørgen Hansen Spliid | 03.09.1976 | 10.06.1993 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Mejlholm | 03.09.1976 | 07.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Morten Gunnar Fossum | 03.09.1976 | 07.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Allan Hermann Christensen | 03.09.1976 | 07.08.1995 | bestyrelse |
Finn Felding | 03.09.1976 | 06.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Lindberg Iversen | 03.09.1976 | 06.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Niels Povl Lund Holm | 03.09.1976 | 06.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Hansen Spliid | 03.09.1976 | 06.07.1994 | bestyrelse |
Povl Erik Hansen | 03.09.1976 | 10.06.1993 | bestyrelse |
Alf Duch-Pedersen | 03.09.1976 | 12.06.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jens Pauli Mønsted | 03.09.1976 | 28.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jørn Bjarne Jensen | 03.09.1976 | 08.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Poul Birger Hedegaard | 03.09.1976 | 08.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Niels Frandsen | 03.09.1976 | 08.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Petersen | 03.09.1976 | 30.11.1987 | bestyrelse |