Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Fritz Eduard Jüngling | 20.06.1973 | 01.10.2004 | direktion |
Hans Erik Andersen | 20.06.1973 | 03.02.1992 | direktion |
Vagn Villy Munksgaard | 20.06.1973 | 17.06.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Rita Nissen | 29.05.1998 | 01.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Fritz Eduard Jüngling | 20.06.1973 | 01.10.2004 | bestyrelse |
Claus Trolle | 20.06.1973 | 01.10.2004 | formand |
Børge Grøn-Iversen | 20.06.1973 | 29.05.1998 | bestyrelse |
Leif Blak Abildgaard | 20.06.1973 | 06.07.1995 | bestyrelse |
Jan Andersson | 20.06.1973 | 03.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Niels Helge Skjødt | 20.06.1973 | 03.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Andersen | 20.06.1973 | 03.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Vagn Villy Munksgaard | 20.06.1973 | 25.06.1991 | formand |
Ove Mattsson | 20.06.1973 | 10.10.1989 | næstformand |
Eggert Benzon | 20.06.1973 | 17.06.1988 | formand |