Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Dorthe Worsøe Horstmann | 07.02.1997 | 03.10.2002 | suppleant |
Ulrich Bruus Madsen | 07.02.1997 | 03.10.2002 | formand |
Ole Thiel | 07.02.1997 | 26.03.2002 | bestyrelse |
Ole Thiel | 07.02.1997 | 07.02.1997 | suppleant |
Bent Hansen | 19.11.1987 | 03.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Gudrun Annette Berg | 19.11.1987 | 03.10.2002 | bestyrelse |
Eva Karin Elise Berg Madsen | 19.11.1987 | 03.10.2002 | suppleant |
Jørgen Horstmann | 19.11.1987 | 03.10.2002 | næstformand |
Poul Martin Mikkelsen | 19.11.1987 | 30.01.1998 | bestyrelse |
Gunnar Hammershøj Sørensen | 19.11.1987 | 27.09.1995 | bestyrelse |
Gudrun Annette Berg | 19.11.1987 | 27.09.1995 | suppleant |
Danna Dagny Morsing | 19.11.1987 | 27.09.1995 | formand |
Hother Kaae | 19.11.1987 | 17.09.1993 | suppleant |
Peter Erik Eriksen | 19.11.1987 | 21.08.1990 | bestyrelse |