Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Peter Broge | 07.06.1973 | 23.05.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Annette Chantelous Tvermoes | 08.11.2006 | 23.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Niels Henrik Broge | 27.10.2003 | 23.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Claus Peter Broge | 07.06.1973 | 23.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Erling Kæmpegaard | 07.06.1973 | 01.10.2010 | suppleant |
Erik Malberg | 07.06.1973 | 08.11.2006 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Gyde Broge | 07.06.1973 | 27.10.2003 | bestyrelse |