Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Neltoft | 18.12.1976 | 16.11.2001 | direktion |
Hans Erik Neltoft | 18.12.1976 | 04.10.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gitte Lindhard | 18.05.1996 | 16.11.2001 | formand |
Peter Neltoft | 18.12.1976 | 16.11.2001 | bestyrelse |
Hans Erik Neltoft | 18.12.1976 | 23.12.1995 | bestyrelse |