Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Nygaard Johansen | 08.10.1985 | 08.10.1998 | direktion |
Erik Madsen | 08.10.1985 | 22.05.1995 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Nygaard Johansen | 08.10.1985 | 08.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Agnes Helene Olsen | 08.10.1985 | 08.10.1998 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Rasmussen | 08.10.1985 | 08.10.1998 | formand |
Erik Madsen | 08.10.1985 | 22.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Kathe Hein Petersen | 08.10.1985 | 22.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Grethe Marie Nielsen | 08.10.1985 | 22.05.1995 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nygaard Johansen | 08.10.1985 | 21.12.1993 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Rasmussen | 08.10.1985 | 16.10.1992 | bestyrelse |