Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Henriksen | 26.06.2002 | 07.04.2009 | direktion |
Ulrik Rugholm Samuelsen | 26.06.2002 | 26.08.2006 | direktion |
Jørgen Nielsen | 01.06.1972 | 26.06.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulrik Rugholm Samuelsen | 26.06.2002 | 09.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Henriksen | 26.06.2002 | 09.12.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Nielsen | 01.06.1972 | 26.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Edith Marie Anita Madsen | 01.06.1972 | 26.06.2002 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Mikael Aistrup | 01.06.1972 | 26.06.2002 | formand |
Bent Rasmussen | 01.06.1972 | 07.06.1989 | bestyrelse |
Mimi Nielsen | 01.06.1972 | 07.06.1989 | formand |