Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Walsøe | 19.03.1997 | 01.02.2005 | direktion |
Erik Pedersen | 09.11.1972 | 19.03.1997 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lis Pedersen | 28.06.2000 | 01.02.2005 | formand |
Jan Walsøe | 19.03.1997 | 01.02.2005 | bestyrelse |
Arne Engel | 09.11.1972 | 01.02.2005 | bestyrelse |
Erik Pedersen | 09.11.1972 | 28.06.2000 | bestyrelse |
Lis Pedersen | 09.11.1972 | 19.03.1997 | bestyrelse |