Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Gildberg | 19.01.2006 | 24.11.2016 | direktion |
Linda Johanna Gildberg | 26.09.2002 | 19.01.2006 | direktion |
Peter Gildberg | 16.04.1973 | 02.07.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Linda Johanna Gildberg | 26.09.2002 | 01.02.2010 | formand |
Bodil Hindhede Gildberg | 26.03.1998 | 24.11.2016 | bestyrelse |
Elise Alkier Gildberg | 31.10.1997 | 24.11.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Petersen | 31.10.1997 | 26.03.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peter Gildberg | 16.04.1973 | 24.11.2016 | bestyrelse |
Peter Gildberg | 16.04.1973 | 02.07.2002 | bestyrelse |
Uve Dinsen | 16.04.1973 | 31.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Kenny Christiansen | 16.04.1973 | 31.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Inge Jessen | 16.04.1973 | 31.10.1997 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Gildberg | 16.04.1973 | 19.03.1992 | bestyrelse |