Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ejvind Bisgaard | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | direktion |
Jens Jakob Simonsen | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | direktion |
Knud Henning Jensen | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | direktion |
Flemming Kirkholt | 05.10.2024 | 31.05.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Ullemose | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Knud Sloth | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Olesen | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peder Christian Larsen Ottosen | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Jes Christian Clausen | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | bestyrelse |
Erik Jensen | 05.10.2024 | 11.09.1992 | formand |
Birgit Overby Serup | 05.10.2024 | 14.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Lone Dam | 05.10.2024 | 14.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Peter Mortensen | 05.10.2024 | 14.02.1992 | bestyrelse |
Inge Bøgh Klarbæk Jørgensen | 05.10.2024 | 14.02.1992 | personlig_suppleant |
Niels Kristian Madsen | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Poul Verner Koch | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Claus Norup Saaby | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Svend Erik Nannberg | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Elmer Nielsen | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Birgit Overby Serup | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Peter Mortensen | 05.10.2024 | 27.09.1991 | personlig_suppleant |
Holger Børge Boertmann Voss | 05.10.2024 | 27.06.1991 | bestyrelse |
Palle Martens | 05.10.2024 | 10.10.1990 | bestyrelse |
Hans Christoph Wiese | 05.10.2024 | 23.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Birthe Krogh | 05.10.2024 | 23.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Ernst Fiil Jensen | 05.10.2024 | 23.08.1990 | bestyrelse |
Frede Østrup | 05.10.2024 | 23.08.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Birgit Andersen | 05.10.2024 | 23.08.1990 | personlig_suppleant |
Gurli Katrine Rohde | 05.10.2024 | 23.08.1990 | personlig_suppleant |